OR SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Oregon Military Department may select any available payment method for cooperative agreements with federal National Guard Bureau. If department selects advance payment method, prohibits department from incurring funding obligation payable or reimbursable from federal moneys under cooperative agreement unless department has available moneys sufficient to meet obligation. Authorizes department to adopt rules as necessary to maintain eligibility of state to receive advance payments under cooperative agreements. Authorizes State Treasurer to create accounts or subaccounts and adopt rules to maintain eligibility to receive advance funding under cooperative agreement with federal bureau.] Authorizes State Treasurer, at request of department, to create accounts in State Treasury pursuant to cooperative agreement or related federal law. Continuously appropriates moneys in such accounts to department.
Title
Relating to federal moneys received by the Oregon Military Department.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 367, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boles, Prusak, Speaker Kotek, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |