OR SB250 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes local government required to have urban growth boundary to include land within boundary when inclusion of land is consistent with local economic development projections and public facilities plans.
Title
Relating to planning for industrial uses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |