OR SB250 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education service districts; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to education service districts; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 705, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G., Weidner. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Dembrow, Doherty, Holvey, Hoyle, Huffman, Jenson, Matthews, Nathanson, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Thompson, Tomei, Witt; Excused, 1--Berger. | |
2011-06-21 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Without recommendation. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-20 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-20 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kruse. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Beyer, Bonamici, Devlin, Dingfelder, Girod, Johnson, Kruse, Nelson, Prozanski, Shields, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Recommendation: Without recommendation, but with amendments returning to President. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-17 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2011-04-01 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-03-30 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-28 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. | |
2011-03-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-03-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Finance and Revenue. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |