OR SB248 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to kindergarten.
Title
Relating to kindergarten.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 704, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kruse. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 23; nays, 5--Girod, Kruse, Prozanski, Shields, Whitsett; excused, 2--Bates, Boquist. | |
2011-06-21 | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Beyer, Buckley, Conger, Cowan, Garrett, Gelser, Gilliam, Hicks, Holvey, Huffman, Hunt, Jenson, Kennemer, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Schaufler, Smith G., Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Witt; Excused, 1--Berger. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-17 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-15 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-03-28 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-03-24 | Third reading. Carried by Hass, Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, Shields. | |
2011-03-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. | |
2011-03-23 | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |