OR SB246 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates requirement that amount of service permit application fee exceeding service permit program costs be dedicated to Alcohol Education Program. Eliminates special fee on licenses and service permits for support of Alcohol Education Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Alcohol Education Program funding.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2019-06-18SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-14SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-29SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-05-29SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-09SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-01-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-01-29SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback