OR SB246 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission to develop low-interest loan program to complete on-site septic system repairs, replacements, upgrades or evaluations. Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission to develop low-interest loan program to complete on-site septic system repairs, replacements, or] upgrades or evaluations. Authorizes commission to adopt rules for administration of loan program by Department of Environmental Quality. Establishes On-site Septic System Loan Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department for purposes of loan program. Designates sources of fund. Directs department to use moneys in fund to provide loans for repair, replacement, or] upgrade or survey of on-site septic systems and to pay administrative costs. Authorizes department to contract with other persons to administer or operate all or any part of loan program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to on-site septic system financing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |