OR SB246 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Business Development Department to establish and administer Oregon Industrial Site Readiness Program to enter into tax reimbursement arrangements with, or to make loans to, qualified project sponsors for development of certified regionally significant industrial sites.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Industrial Site Readiness Program; appropriating money; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 763, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 15--Barton, Clem, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Gorsek, Greenlick, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Nathanson, Thatcher, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Dingfelder, George, Thomsen. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |