OR SB234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to renew coordinated care organization contract for another five-year term if specified conditions are met.
Title
Relating to coordinated care organization contracts with the Oregon Health Authority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |