OR SB233 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases salaries of state court judges. Increases salaries of state court judges. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to compensation of judges; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |