OR SB232 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows out-of-state physician or physician assistant to provide specified care to patients located in Oregon. Allows out-of-state physician or physician assistant to provide specified care to patients located in Oregon. Clarifies that practice of medicine using telemedicine occurs where patient is physically located. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the practice of medicine via remote means; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Chapter 147, 2023 Laws. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 2--Cate, Morgan; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Breese-Iverson, Cramer, Hieb, Sanchez, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Carried over to 02-07 by unanimous consent. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |