OR SB232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements of report on Educators Equity Act that is prepared by state agencies. Directs Department of Education, in collaboration with Teacher Standards and Practices Commission, to conduct study to identify most effective methods to diversify educator workforce and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education.] Sunsets December 31, 2021.] Modifies requirements of report on Educators Equity Act that is prepared by state agencies. Directs Educator Advancement Council to participate in creation of report. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to educator diversity; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 331, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wilde, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-05-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, President Courtney. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |