OR SB230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to coordinate with Oregon FFA Association to increase student achievement and improve college attendance and career placement for students enrolled in agricultural education courses. Directs department to establish grant program for purpose of funding extended duty contracts to manage agricultural science and technology programs of study during summer months. Directs expenses of grant program to be paid from High School Graduation and College and Career Readiness Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to agricultural education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] |
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |