OR SB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President.
Pending: Senate Finance and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President.
Pending: Senate Finance and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that unused portion of amount of pass-through revenue bonds authorized for issuance in preceding biennium carries forward until legislation authorizing amount of pass-through revenue bonds for current biennium is enacted. Provides that unused portion of amount of pass-through revenue bonds authorized for issuance in preceding biennium carries forward until legislation authorizing amount of pass-through revenue bonds for current biennium is enacted. Provides that entity that is authorized to issue private activity bonds] state agency on behalf of which private activity bonds may be issued may suballocate its private activity bond allocation to other issuers. Adjusts terminology relating to conduit revenue bonds. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to bonding; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Housing and Development (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Housing and Development (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development by order of the President. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |