OR SB222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Prozanski changed his vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Prozanski changed his vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries to accept payments by credit card and to add fee to credit card transactions. Authorizes State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries to accept payments by credit card and to add fee to credit card transactions.
Title
Relating to payments to State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries by credit card.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Prozanski changed his vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 14--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Prozanski, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Sollman. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Carried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Carried over to 04-04 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |