OR SB215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Veto sustained in accordance with Art. V, sec. 15b, Oregon Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Veto sustained in accordance with Art. V, sec. 15b, Oregon Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits district school board to enter into written agreement with federally recognized Native American tribe in Oregon that is located closest to school district with respect to name, symbol or image of mascot associated with a Native American tribe, expected behavior of students and spectators at athletic events with respect to mascot, and training on cultural diversity that athletic directors or other persons identified by school board are required to complete.
Title
Relating to school mascots; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Rep. Betsy Close [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-02 | Senate | Veto sustained in accordance with Art. V, sec. 15b, Oregon Constitution. |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Motion to lay bill, together with Governor's message, on the table carried. |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Governor's veto message entered into Journal. |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Dingfelder, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Rosenbaum, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 19--Bailey, Barton, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gallegos, Garrett, Gorsek, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Matthews, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-06-04 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-05-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Education. |
2013-04-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 4--Dingfelder, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Rosenbaum; excused, 2--Devlin, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |