OR SB211 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for electing precinct committeepersons. Requires one committeeperson for every 500 electors, rather than one committeeperson by gender for every 500 electors, who are registered in precinct. Provides that write-in candidate may be eligible for election to precinct committeeperson position if no other candidate for position exists. Requires write-in candidate to signify acceptance of successful write-in candidacy before primary election, rather than after election. Allows person selected to fill vacancy in office of precinct committeeperson to vote on election of county central committee officers on or after 61st day after selection.
Title
Relating to precinct committeepersons.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB211 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB211/Introduced |