OR SB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 480, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 480, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person commits offense of driving while under influence of intoxicants if person has blood alcohol level of 0.08 percent or more by weight within two hours after driving vehicle. Provides that person commits offense of driving while under influence of intoxicants if person has blood alcohol level of 0.08 percent or more by weight within two hours after driving vehicle. Creates affirmative defense.] Modifies description of prior offenses in other jurisdictions related to driving while under influence of intoxicants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to driving while under the influence of intoxicants; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 480, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Rayfield, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |