OR SB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district attorney of each county to adopt written policies concerning guilty except for insanity dispositions. Requires district attorney of each county to adopt written policies concerning guilty except for insanity cases] dispositions. Requires policies to be adopted and made available to public no later than December 1, 2022.
Title
Relating to district attorney policies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 329, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 6--Bonham, Cate, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Zika; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wilde, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |