OR SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows listed eastern Oregon counties that undertake economic opportunity analysis to designate up to 50 acres outside urban growth boundaries for industrial and other employment uses notwithstanding statewide planning goals related to agriculture, forest use or urbanization. Excludes high-value farmland. Requires county coordination with State Forester and nearby cities.
Title
Relating to employment opportunities in eastern Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 170, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem, Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 5--Findley, Greenlick, Hayden, Keny-Guyer, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Rayfield, Williamson. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Beyer, Knopp. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |