OR SB187 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to reimburse education provider for expenses incurred from providing vision screenings. Establishes Vision Health Account for purpose of making reimbursements. Appropriates moneys to Department of Education for deposit in Vision Health Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vision screenings; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-10SenateEffective date, August 2, 2017.
2017-08-10SenateChapter 640, 2017 Laws.
2017-08-02SenateGovernor signed.
2017-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-07-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2017-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2017-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-06-28SenateWork Session held.
2017-06-27SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2017-06-27SenateWork Session held.
2017-06-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-06-07SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2017-02-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-02-21SenateWork Session held.
2017-02-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Education, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback