OR SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Effective date, March 27, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Effective date, March 27, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes index for determining cost of living adjustments to limitations on damages under Oregon Tort Claims Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to adjustments to limitations under the Oregon Tort Claims Act; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Effective date, March 27, 2019. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 12, 2019 Laws. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--McLain, McLane, Witt. |
2019-03-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Olsen; Excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |