OR SB170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 701, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hanna. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-20 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-17 | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-16 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-07 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Rules by order of the President. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-19 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-12 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |