OR SB1606 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, July 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, July 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits hospital from conditioning admission or treatment, or suggesting that treatment is conditioned, on patient having POLST or executing advance directive or other instruction regarding administration, withholding or withdrawing of life-sustaining procedures or artificially administered nutrition and hydration. Prohibits hospital from conditioning admission or treatment, or suggesting that treatment is conditioned, on patient having POLST or executing advance directive or other instruction regarding administration, withholding or withdrawing of life-sustaining procedures or artificially administered nutrition and hydration. Requires hospital to permit presence of support person for person with disability in emergency department and during hospital stay under specified conditions. Allows hospital to impose conditions to ensure safety of patient, support person and staff. Authorizes civil penalty or revocation or suspension of license] for violations of specified provisions. Requires health care provider to immediately notify state protection and advocacy organization if, during state of emergency or public health emergency, person acting on behalf of patient with intellectual or developmental disability authorizes withholding or withdrawing of life-sustaining procedures or artificially administered nutrition and hydration or transfer of patient to hospice care or if patient is denied services, care, equipment or treatment based on crisis care guidance.] Requires notification to Department of Human Services case manager, if any, and state protection and advocacy organization] before withholding or withdrawing from person with intellectual or developmental disability life-sustaining procedures or artificially administered nutrition and hydration during state of emergency or state of public health emergency]. Creates unlawful practice of denying medical treatment or restricting or limiting allocation of medical resources to protected class or based on patient's race, color, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, age or disability.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date, July 7, 2020. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Chapter 20, 2020 Laws. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Clem, McKeown. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |