OR SB16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Effective date, May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Effective date, May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Department of Corrections facilitated dialogue or responsibility letter bank program facilitator, advisory committee member or staff person from being compelled to testify or produce evidence concerning facilitated dialogue and responsibility letter bank program communications, except as provided by department rule. Exempts program facilitators, advisory committee members and staff persons from civil liability related to program participation, except in specified circumstances. Provides that program communications are confidential and inadmissible in subsequent judicial, administrative or arbitration proceeding, except as provided by department rule. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Department of Corrections restorative justice program communications; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Effective date, May 18, 2017. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 114, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McLane. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |