OR SB1599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes July 1, 2015, as date for determination of total number of registered electors in this state for purpose of maintaining status as major political party through 2018 general election. Establishes July 1, 2015, as date for determination of total number of registered electors in this state for purpose of maintaining status as major political party through 2020] 2018 general election.
Title
Relating to calculation for maintaining status as a major political party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2017. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 119, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 46; Nays, 10--Bentz, Esquivel, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Davis, Gorsek, Komp, Olson. |
2016-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |