OR SB1597 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies provisions relating to issuance of certain Article XI-Q bonds. Directs State Treasurer to consult with Legislative Fiscal Office and Oregon Department of Administrative Services when preparing documents or materials for State Debt Policy Advisory Commission. Deletes provision stating that expenditures made by State Fair Council from appropriations made to Oregon Department of Administrative Services on behalf of council are obligation owing from council to department. Authorizes Higher Education Coordinating Commission to expend previously authorized moneys for certain community college project. Directs Judicial Department to deposit certain moneys received by department prior to July 1, 2013 into State Court Technology Fund. Increases judicial salaries. Creates Oregon Capitol History Gateway Fund and Oregon State Capitol Operating Fund for moneys related to projects and operation of Oregon State Capitol Foundation. Transfers moneys from Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account to Public Health Account for expenses of pilot project related to increasing awareness among youth of impact of using marijuana and marijuana-derived products. Directs Department of Revenue to repay amount of transfer plus two percent from Oregon Marijuana Account not later than September 30, 2017. Clarifies that declared earnings on moneys in Oregon Growth Account are transferred in manner prescribed for other declared earnings on moneys in Education Stability Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 118, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Post, Weidner. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |