OR SB159 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits contracting agency to grant preference to procuring for public use goods or services that are provided by nonprofit organization incorporated, organized, formed or created for charitable purpose under laws of this state, if goods or services cost not more than 10 percent more than goods or services available from contractor that is not nonprofit organization. Permits contracting agency to grant preference to procuring for public use goods or services that are provided by nonprofit organization incorporated, organized, formed or created for charitable purpose under laws of this state, if goods or services cost not more than 10 percent more than goods or services available from contractor that is not nonprofit organization. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public contract preferences for nonprofit organizations dedicated to charitable purposes; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |