OR SB1589 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Effective date, April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Effective date, April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that maximum loading weight of motorboat must be less than 5,500 pounds to obtain towed watersports motorboat certificate. Provides that maximum loading weight of motorboat must be less than 5,000] 5,500 pounds to obtain towed watersports motorboat certificate. Authorizes State Marine Board to conduct study related to increasing or decreasing prescribed maximum loading weight. Provides that person shall carry towed watersports endorsement if engaged in any towed watersports within Newberg Pool Congested Zone. Modifies definitions of "Newberg Pool Congested Zone," "towed watersports" and "wake surfing." Prohibits person from wake surfing or using devices or individuals to increase wakes in Newberg Pool Congested Zone. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to motorboats; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Effective date, April 15, 2022. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 119, 2022 Laws. |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-03 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf, Williams. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Wilde, Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 25--Bonham, Bynum, Cate, Evans, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Ruiz, Scharf, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Williams, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson. |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2022-02-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 6--Boquist, Linthicum, Manning Jr, Robinson, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |