OR SB1589 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes definition of "qualified business" eligible for loan or credit guarantees from Credit Enhancement Fund to include existing or proposed businesses located in this state that will produce substantial benefits for state. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Credit Enhancement Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 116, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Komp. |
2016-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Motion to refer to committee on Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |