OR SB1586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs public universities and community colleges to increase voter registration access and information. Requires state to pay for ballot return envelopes that can be returned by business reply mail for each election held in this state.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to voting; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 114, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Barreto, Hayden, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 3--McLane, Williamson, Speaker Kotek. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng). |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |