OR SB1579 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12 Effective date, April 11, 2012.
2012-04-12 Chapter 107, 2012 Laws.
2012-04-11 Governor signed.
2012-03-21 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-03-06 President signed.
2012-03-05 Vote explanation(s) filed by Hunt.
2012-03-05 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Weidner.
2012-03-05 Rules suspended. Second reading.
2012-03-05 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-03-05 Referred to Ways and Means.
2012-03-05 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2012-03-05 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Boquist, Edwards, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett.
2012-03-05 Second reading.
2012-03-05 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)(Amendments distributed)
2012-03-05 Work Session held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Ways and Means.
2012-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback