OR SB1569 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes State Board of Towing within Department of Transportation. Authorizes board to order department to deny, suspend, revoke or refuse to renew towing business certificate or letter of appointment to participate on rotational list of towing businesses for certain violations. Authorizes board to impose civil penalties for certain violations. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Increases limitation on expenditures by department for certain expenses. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to towing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |