OR SB1567 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes ability of major political party to use party rule, rather than primary election, to select party nominee in situations when vacancy in state office or office of state Senator occurs on or before 70th day before primary election and remaining two years of term of office are filled by electors at next general election. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to method major political parties use to nominate candidates to fill vacancies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 86, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2018-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 6--Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |