OR SB1567 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies reinstatement rights of management service employees who have immediate prior former regular status in classified service. Establishes process for management service employees to appeal employment decisions to Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services. .
Title
Relating to management service employees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 22, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Komp, Thatcher, Thompson. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |