OR SB1565 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes rates of compensation to be paid by Oregon Liquor Control Commission to distillery retail outlet agent for distilled liquor retail sales by agent. Sunsets rates January 2, 2025. Increases expenditure limit for Oregon Liquor Control Commission payment of expenses, from moneys other than lottery funds or federal funds for biennium ending June 30, 2021, for purpose of paying distillery retail outlet agent compensation.
Title
Relating to distillery retail outlet agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |