OR SB1565 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, June 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, June 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes city or county to adopt exemption for newly constructed or installed industrial improvements at location in rural area that have cost of initial investment of at least $1 million and not more than $25 million. Authorizes city or county to adopt exemption for newly constructed or installed industrial improvements with] at location in rural area that have cost of initial investment of at least $1 million and not more than $25 million. Provides that qualified property must be owned or leased by applicant and used through final year of exemption for purpose and at location identified in application. Provides exemption shall be granted as 100 percent exemption for any three of five consecutive years unless city or county adopts other terms. Provides that ordinance or resolution granting exemption may not take effect unless rates of taxation of taxing districts whose governing bodies agree to grant exemption equal 75 percent or more of total combined rate of taxation. Requires exemption to be granted to all eligible industrial improvements on same terms in effect on date application is submitted. Prohibits stacking of exemptions or special assessments other than exemption for commercial facilities under construction. Allows city or county to amend or terminate exemption, subject to approval process of taxing districts described above, but provides that industrial improvements granted exemption continue to receive exemption under terms in effect at time exemption was first granted. Authorizes city or county to grant deferral of property taxes instead of exemption within same parameters. Provides for clawbacks of tax exemption savings or deferred taxes upon disqualification of industrial improvements. If application for exemption is otherwise eligible for approval, requires city or county and applicant to agree to conditions related to hiring and employment and other reasonable conditions related to economic development established by city or county. Requires city or county to approve application by resolution that states agreed upon conditions and notifies county assessor and Department of Revenue of approval. Requires city or county that has granted exemption under Act to submit certain information related to exemption to Department of Revenue for posting on Oregon transparency website. Sunsets authority of city or county to adopt exemption or deferral on January 2, 2027] 2024. Provides that industrial improvements granted exemption or deferral before sunset date continue to receive exemption or deferral under terms in effect at time granted. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax benefits; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, June 2, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 112, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2016-03-02 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith Warner. |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barton, Smith Warner; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson. |
2016-03-02 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barton, Smith Warner; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson. |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2016-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Kruse, Winters. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |