OR SB1565 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective date, March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective date, March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dispensing of drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to dispensing of drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Effective date, March 5, 2012. | |
2012-03-13 | Chapter 34, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-05 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-24 | President signed. | |
2012-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Berger, Hunt. | |
2012-02-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 22, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Johnson; excused, 2--Bates, Morse. | |
2012-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-06 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |