OR SB1563 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Business Development Department to undertake entrepreneurial development activities for traded sector industries and in rural communities. Increases cap on entrepreneurial development loans from $70,000 to $100,000. Increases allowable period of entrepreneurial development loans from five to 10 years. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to entrepreneurial development; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, February 26, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 3, 2014 Laws. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2014-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 2--Davis, Matthews; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. |
2014-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Rural Communities. |
2014-02-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum, Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |