OR SB1563 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to members of the uniformed services; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to members of the uniformed services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective date, April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Chapter 106, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Repassed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Huffman; Excused, 2--Smith G., Thatcher; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2012-03-01 | House adopted Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-02-29 | Conference Committee Report read in House. | |
2012-02-29 | Conference Committee Recommendation: The House recede from House amendments dated 02-23 and A-Engrossed bill be repassed. (No Senate action required). | |
2012-02-29 | Representatives Cowan, Esquivel, Parrish, Witt appointed House conferees. | |
2012-02-29 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-28 | Senators Boquist, Hass, Monnes Anderson appointed Senate conferees. | |
2012-02-28 | Senate refused to concur in House amendments. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Devlin, Dingfelder, George. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Veterans Affairs. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Veterans' and Military Affairs. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |