OR SB1560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for additional exemption against Oregon estate tax. Phases out availability of exemption based on size of estate. Applies to estates of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to estate tax; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/SB1560 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1560/Introduced |