OR SB1559 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits inclusion of Oregon Liquor Control Commission in definition of "criminal justice agency" for purposes of certain statutes dealing with fingerprinting, criminal background checks, agency information and data sharing and other matters. Establishes Oregon Liquor Control Commission Modernization Task Force. Requires task force to undertake evaluation of existing system for distributing and selling distilled liquor and identify and evaluate potential means for modernizing system. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than October 1, 2014.Ù RemovesÙ Limits inclusion of Oregon Liquor Control Commission fromÙ in definition of "criminal justice agency" for purposes of certain statutes dealing with fingerprinting, criminal background checks, agency information and data sharing and other matters. Adds liquor enforcement inspectors to definition of criminal justice agency.Ù Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alcoholic beverages; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 119, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Freeman, Gilliam, Weidner; Excused, 2--Conger, Thompson.
2014-03-07HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2014-03-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2014-03-07HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-03-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-06SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Amendments distributed.
2014-03-05SenateWork Session held.
2014-03-05SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2014-03-05SenateWork Session held.
2014-03-04SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-26SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2014-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-20SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2014-02-18SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2014-02-18SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1559
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1559/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20100
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20286
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319206
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319284

Bill Comments

feedback