OR SB1553 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Long Term Care Ombudsman, in consultation with Residential Facilities Advisory Committee, to appoint Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator in office of Long Term Care Ombudsman to provide public guardian and conservator services for persons claiming to be without relatives or friends willing or able to serve as guardians or conservators and claiming to lack financial resources to obtain private guardian or conservator. Authorizes Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator, in consultation with and subject to approval of Long Term Care Ombudsman, to hire or contract with volunteers, staff, deputy public guardians and conservators and other qualified individuals. Prescribes duties and responsibilities of Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator. Imposes certain limitations on court orders in proceedings involving Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator. Directs office of Long Term Care Ombudsman to identify and coordinate programs, services and assistance for persons with inadequate legal, financial and medical resourcesÙ receiving public guardian and conservator services, to contract with qualified individuals and entities to provide programs, services and assistance to persons with inadequate resourcesÙ receiving public guardian and conservator services in areas of state where such programs, services and assistance are inadequate or nonexistent and to contract with state protection and advocacy system. Establishes Partnership Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to office of Long Term Care Ombudsman to pay for assistance to persons with inadequate resources.Ù Directs office of Long Term Care Ombudsman to supervise, monitor, advise and support Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator. Authorizes use of funds in Long Term Care Ombudsman Account to carry out responsibilities of Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator. Directs Governor to appoint two members with expertise in guardianship, conservatorship and fiduciary services to Residential Facilities Advisory Committee. Renames existing offices of public guardian and conservator as offices of county public guardian and conservator. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to office of Long Term Care Ombudsman for Partnership Fund.Ù Appropriates moneys from General Fund to office of Long Term Care Ombudsman for deposit into Long Term Care Ombudsman Account to carry out responsibilities of Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator.Ù Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to services for persons with inadequate resources; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 117, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2014-03-05HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2014-03-04HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2014-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-26SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-17SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Health Care and Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1553
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1553/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20037
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20229
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318735
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318915

Bill Comments

feedback