OR SB155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires investigations of all reports involving suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct by school employees, contractors, agents and volunteers. Establishes requirements for law enforcement agencies and Department of Human Services to conduct investigations related to reports of abuse that involve child and person who is school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer. Establishes requirements for Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to conduct investigations related to reports of suspected sexual conduct that may have been committed by school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer who is licensed by commission. Establishes requirements for Department of Education to conduct investigations related to reports of suspected sexual conduct that may have been committed by school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer who is not licensed by commission. Allows education provider to use findings of agencies when making employment determinations. Prescribes timelines for completing investigations and making employment determinations. Revises definitions of terms of "education provider," "sexual conduct" and "student" for purposes of certain laws related to abuse and sexual conduct by school employees, contractors, agents and volunteers. Prohibits individual who is school employee, contractor or agent from assisting other school employee, contractor or agent in obtaining new job if individual knows or has probable cause to believe school employee, contractor or agent engaged in abuse or sexual contact with student. Provides exceptions. Allows commission to discipline individual for any violations of prohibition. Prohibits certain agreements or contracts that have effect of terminating or impairing ongoing investigations or of suppressing information relating to substantiated report of abuse or sexual conduct. Directs Department of Human Services and law enforcement agencies that receive report of child abuse to notify Department of Education if alleged child abuse occurred in school or was related to school-sponsored activity. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to interpersonal boundary invasions affecting youth; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Student Success (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, rescind subsequent referral to Judiciary and be referred to Rules by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Student Success (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, rescind subsequent referral to Judiciary and be referred to Rules by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 23, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 618, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Roblan. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by Order of the Presient. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Student Success by order of the President. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Student Success. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and rescind subsequent referral to Judiciary. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |