OR SB1548 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, July 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, July 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain statutes that reference "physician" to include references to "physician assistant" and "nurse practitioner." Takes effect July 1, 2014.
Title
Relating to mid-level health care practitioners; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 45, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hicks. |
2014-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |