OR SB1546 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies procedures for providing notice to defendant in charging instrument and at arraignment when conviction would result in firearm prohibition. Specifies procedures for proving nature of relationship between defendant and alleged victim for certain crimes. Directs court to make determination concerning relationship and enter order prohibiting defendant from possessing firearms. Directs court to notify Department of State Police and county sheriff concerning prohibition order for entry into databases. Appropriates moneys to department to fund entry of order into Law Enforcement Data System. Requires law enforcement agency to directly notify restraining order petitioner, instead of Department of Justice, when respondent requests return of firearm or ammunition. Shifts duty to receive complaints alleging law enforcement profiling from Law Enforcement Contacts Policy and Data Review Committee to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission. Exempts from definition of "commercial motor vehicle" emergency vehicles operated by police officers. Creates exception to 28-day time limit for detention of youth if request for waiver hearing is pending. Permits youth to waive 10-day detention review hearings. Extends frequency of detention review hearings to 30 days if request for waiver hearing is pending. Permits youth to waive individual 30-day detention review hearing. Declares venue of juvenile proceeding subject to waiver hearing to be county where alleged act was committed. Prohibits venue transfer unless court determines case may not be waived or state stipulates it will not request waiver. Authorizes certain youth offenders who are less than 20 years of age to be admitted to youth correction facility. Authorizes law enforcement agency to employ person as law enforcement officer without getting second psychological screening in certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public safety; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2020-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-25SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-19SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2020-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback