OR SB1544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local government to disclose payment distribution amounts made pursuant to agreement to collect taxes imposed on sale of marijuana items. Enables person responsible for marijuana grow site, registry identification cardholder or designated primary caregiver to obtain immature marijuana plants from recreational marijuana producers. Exempts certain processing of marijuana for medical purposes from testing requirements. Clarifies information that application for marijuana grow site registration must include. Limits number of immature marijuana plants that are less than 24 inches in height allowed at marijuana grow sites to number established by Oregon Health Authority by rule. Exempts certain medical marijuana grow sites from tracking requirements. Changes reporting date for Oregon Cannabis Commission. Allows certain marijuana establishments to be located within 1,000 feet of school. Requires industrial hemp item sold by marijuana retailer to carry label identifying whether product is derived from hemp or marijuana. Prohibits anyone other than marijuana retailer from selling marijuana item to consumer. Establishes Illegal Marijuana Market Enforcement Grant Program to assist local governments with costs incurred by local law enforcement agencies in addressing unlawful marijuana cultivation or distribution operations. Sunsets program on January 2, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to marijuana; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Effective date, June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 103, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 8--Boles, Esquivel, Helfrich, Kennemer, Olson, Parrish, Post, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Johnson, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |