OR SB1544 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to economic development; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to economic development; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12 Effective date, April 11, 2012.
2012-04-12 Chapter 105, 2012 Laws.
2012-04-11 Governor signed.
2012-02-27 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-02-24 President signed.
2012-02-23 Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2012-02-23 Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 30--Bentz, Berger, Brewer, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lindsay, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sheehan, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Wand, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard, Speaker Hanna.
2012-02-22 Second reading.
2012-02-21 Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2012-02-21 Recommendation: Do pass.
2012-02-16 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2012-02-14 Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
2012-02-14 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2012-02-13 Third reading. Carried by Telfer, Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
2012-02-10 Second reading.
2012-02-09 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2012-02-07 Work Session held.
2012-02-02 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development.
2012-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback