OR SB1543 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of group license for angling or shellfish to nonprofit organization serving veterans or certain armed forces members. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to State Department of Fish and Wildlife licenses; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr, Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Veterans. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |