OR SB1541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to conduct study on expenditure variations among school districts. Directs Department of Education to conduct evaluation of] study on expenditure variations among school districts. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to school financial accountability; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 111, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hansell granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 25--Barreto, Barton, Bentz, Boone, Buehler, Esquivel, Greenlick, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, McLane, Piluso, Post, Smith Warner, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 4--Davis, Gorsek, Komp, Olson. |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Knopp; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-17 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |