OR SB1540 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain persons that service student loans in this state to obtain or renew license. Specifies license application and renewal procedures, required fees and persons that are exempt from requirement. Prescribes duties of licensee and requires licensee to maintain specified liquidity, operating reserves and tangible net worth. Prescribes civil penalty against person that engages in business as student loan servicer without license. Permits Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to participate in multistate examinations under specified circumstances. Becomes operative on July 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to student loan servicers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |